judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEITH D. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1406
Short Caption:KEITH D. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14763-88Filed Date:11/30/1989

Opening Event Date:11/30/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/19/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/27/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/05/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKeith D. Johnson N
Charles F. DaumYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, KEITH D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/7/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE BY NOTE - 01 10/24/90; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 11/28/90; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 02 12/17/90; SCHED CASE ON FEB. NOTE - 03 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 03
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/02/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DAUMC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - WIEGANDB FOR - APPELLEE
11/30/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/19/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CHARLES F. DAUM, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/02/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 122989 SCHPRD DSA
02/14/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD R
02/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(133 PGS. & 87 PGS. -- MOLLICHELLI) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD RT
02/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (8 PGS. -- PAVLISH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051090 SCHPRD RT
03/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (5 PGS. -- EDLEY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD RT
04/04/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (8 PGS. -- HUNT) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051290 SCHPRD RT
06/19/1990FiledRecord Completed
06/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (125-PGS/WHALEN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 052890 SCHPRD RT
09/07/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. JJ FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE. JJ PANELFF SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD B
10/24/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 102490 SCHPRD BA
11/27/1990FiledBriefing Completed
11/27/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 112890 SCHPRD BE
01/23/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1991RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT 2/5/91 AT 9:30AM MEH PANELFF SCDATE 012491 SCHPRD VS
01/31/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO LATE FILE REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELROTEKN SCDATE 012891 SCHPRD VS
01/31/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/05/1991ARGUED PANELRGTEKN SCDATE 020591 SCHPRD CSUM
08/21/1991REVERSED AND REMANDED THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL HAS BEEN REV & REMANDED. DS- KERN. AD PANELROTEKE SCDATE 020591 SCHPRD RDEC
08/21/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 596 A.2d 511 DS-KERN
09/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD