judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALEX VS. LAS VEGAS METRO. POLICE DEP'T

Case Information: 42850
Short Caption:ALEX VS. LAS VEGAS METRO. POLICE DEP'TCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A465138Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Douglas, ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/26/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/26/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/26/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-03709
03/10/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A465138: 120 days. fn 2--[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 04-04521
04/19/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
06/21/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-11292
06/21/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/13/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Appellant must file the appeal statement on or before 10/24/05. No response required unless ordered by this court. (Pilot program civil appeal statement mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-18141
10/26/2005BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 05-21240
10/26/2005Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision.
11/15/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Parraguirre. Sat in district court proceedings.
11/17/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 05-22708
12/14/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-23367
12/14/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/21/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 16, 2005. 05-23367