judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WINSOR VS. SMITH

Case Information: 44847
Short Caption:WINSOR VS. SMITHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A454526Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/16/2005 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/30/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/10/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Rawlings Olson Cannon Gormley & Desruisseaux--check no. 79376.
03/10/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-04798
03/16/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/18/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: January 4, 5, 6, 7, 12, 2005 and December 6, 2005. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. 05-05384
03/21/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: January 4, 5, 6, 7, 13, 2005. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. 05-05433
03/22/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Gregory Miles, returning "Notice of Cross-Appeal," "Docketing Statement," and check in the amount of $250. Cross-Appeal was not filed in district court. 05-05549
03/24/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 05-05731
03/28/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Woods, Erickson, Whitaker & Miles, LLP--check no. 20930.
03/28/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 05-05922
03/28/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. (cross-appellant Smith) Due Date: 10 days
03/29/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 05-06081
03/30/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-06196
03/30/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson. (Notice of Cross-Appeal)
04/07/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on March 31, 2005. 05-06850
04/14/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson. (case appeal statement)
05/23/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Monday, Decemb er 6, 2004; Tuesday, January 4, 2005, 1:05 P.M.; Wednesday, January 5, 2005, 10:40 A.M.; Thursday, January 6, 2005, 1:10 P.M.; Friday, January 7, 2005, 9:05 A.M.; Thursday, January 13, 2005, 1:00 P.M. Court Reporter: Beverly Sigurnik. 05-10125
06/01/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-10745
07/13/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Court Reporter Beverly Sigurnik filed several transcripts. If respondent/cross-appellant, Juliana Smith does not require any additional transcripts to she shall file a certificate indicating that she will not be requesting any transcripts within 10 days from the date of this order. If Ms. Smith does require additional transcripts, she shall file a transcript request form within 10 days from the date of this order. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix on appeal. Within 30 days of service of that brief, respondents World Marketing Alliance, Inc. and R. Spencer Van Pelt ('respondents') shall file and serve an answering brief on appeal and cross-appellant shall file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of respondents' answering brief and cross-appellant's combined brief to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Cross-appellant shall have 30 days from service of appellant's combined brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. 05-13904
08/04/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Smith. 05-15468
09/22/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Winsor. 05-18825
09/22/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 05-18826
10/06/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant and cross-appellant shall have 30 days to show cause why this appeal and cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule shall be suspended. Respondent and cross-respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that responses are served. 05-19815
10/12/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Notice of Change of Firm of Record and Notice of Address Change. 05-20244
10/14/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Juliana Smith's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. 05-20320
10/14/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Smith. 05-20321
10/21/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Juliana Smith's Response. 05-20894
10/25/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Lavar Anthony Winsor's Response to Order to Show Cause. 05-21120
11/08/2005MotionFiled Reply to Response. Respondents World Marketing Alliance, Inc., and R. Spencer Van Pelt's Response to Order to Show Cause. 05-22033
03/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant and cross-appellant shall have 30 days to show cause why this appeal and cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal and cross-appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent and cross-respondent may file any reply within 10 days form the date that appellant's and cross-appellant's response is served. 06-05222
04/10/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Juliana Smith's Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-07465
04/11/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant/Coss-Respondent Lavar Anthony Winsor's Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-07597
05/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reinstating Briefing. We conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal and we reinstate the briefing schedule. Respondents World Marketing Alliance, Inc. and R. Spencer Van Pelt: 30 days to file and serve their answering briefs. Appellant/cross-respondent Winsor: 30 days from the date of service of respondents' answering briefs to file and serve his combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent/cross-appellant Smith: 30 days from the date of service of Winsor's combined brief to file and serve her reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. 06-10791
06/21/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. (Respondents World Marketing Alliance and R. Spencer Van Pelt). 06-12935
06/21/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. (Respondents World Marketing Alliance and R. Spencer Van Pelt). Supplemental Excerpts of Record. (Received table of contents via fax and attached to inside front cover of appendix on 06/21/06). 06-12937
07/24/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent.) Brief due: August 21, 2006. 06-15358
08/16/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent- Winsor. (Reply Brief filed in response to the Respondents' and Cross-Appellants' Answering Briefs.) 06-17110
09/25/2006Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal filed.
02/05/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. of Change of Firm Record and Notice of Change of Address. 07-02859
03/07/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Royal Jones Miles Dunkley & Wilson in place and stead of Woods Erickson Whitaker Miles & Maurice. (Attorney Gregory Miles remains as counsel--new law firm.) 07-05404
05/30/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 07-11858
05/30/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP07-MG/MD/MC
09/28/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART." SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-21439
10/22/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Royal Jones Miles Dunkley & Wilson. 07-23243
10/23/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-22180
10/23/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/01/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2007. 07-22180