judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE MOZELLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1418
Short Caption:TYRONE MOZELLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1690-82Filed Date:11/14/1989

Opening Event Date:11/14/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/03/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/26/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/10/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/09/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrone Mozelle NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
John W. Kern YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MOZELLE, TYRONE UNITED STATES
11/14/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/02/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 011690 SCHPRD R
03/03/1990FiledRecord Completed
03/05/1990ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE DSA W/IN 20 DAYS AND APLE TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 20 DAYS; NFX FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1990LETTER OF APLT WANTS TO KNOW STATUS OF CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS FOR 20 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD DSA
03/21/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/26/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD BE
03/29/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990ORDER THAT THE REQUEST TO FILE DKTG STMT IS GRTD AND THE LODGED DKTG STMT IS FILED SL PANELRBH SCDATE 031490 SCHPRD N
09/05/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT PRO SE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990ORDER APLT'S PRO SE MOTION TO PRE- SENT ORAL ARGUMENT IS DENIED. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 090790 SCHPRD VS
10/10/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/10/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGSTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/09/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD