judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID W. MORGAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1407
Short Caption:DAVID W. MORGAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8754-88Filed Date:11/28/1989

Opening Event Date:11/28/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/23/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/30/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/11/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/06/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid W. Morgan N
L. Robert Miller YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Helen M. Bollwerk YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORGAN, DAVID W. UNITED STATES
11/28/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/19/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) L. ROBERT MILLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 122989 SCHPRD DSA
02/21/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD R
05/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(81 PGS/MITCHELL) AD PANEL SCDATE 050890 SCHPRD RT
05/23/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD CHECK
05/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(305 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD RT
05/23/1990RECORD COMPLETED
06/26/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 070290 SCHPRD BA
07/30/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 073090 SCHPRD BE
07/30/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/11/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/11/1992SUBMITTED PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/06/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD