Case Information: 44840 | |||
Short Caption: | LASPINA VS. LUTTRELL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43520 , 43838 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A483228 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/13/2005 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/09/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/09/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 05-04740 | |
03/16/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A483228 : 120 days. fn 1--[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. | 05-05168 | |
07/05/2005 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 5. | 05-13239 | |
07/05/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/29/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Appellant must file the appeal statement on or before 10/10/05. No response required unless ordered by this court. (Pilot program civil appeal statement mailed to proper person appellant.) | 05-17042 | |
10/13/2005 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 05-20272 | |
10/13/2005 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. | ||
01/31/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC | 07-02452 | |
02/07/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Order Dismissing Appeal, addressed to Shirlee Laspina, returned. (Return envelope indicates the addressee is Deceased.) | ||
02/27/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-04367 | |
02/27/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/05/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2007. | 07-04367 | |
03/06/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Remittitur addressed to Shirlee Laspina returned-Deceased. |