judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SANDRA L. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1396
Short Caption:SANDRA L. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6279-89Filed Date:11/06/1989

Opening Event Date:11/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/10/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/24/1991
Argued/Submitted:01/23/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/13/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSandra L. Williams N
G. Godwin Oyewole YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, SANDRA L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/27/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 BY 8/20/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 9/24/91; REPLY BRF OF ALPT, IF NOTE - 02 ANY, DUE BY 10/15/91; SCHED NOTE - 03 CASE ON JAN 1992 CAL.; NFX. NOTE - 03
11/06/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/11/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) G. GODWIN OYEWOLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 122189 SCHPRD DSA
02/21/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 010590 SCHPRD R
03/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (243 PGS. -- FINNERIN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (355-PGS/HART) AJ PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD RT
05/10/1991RECORD COMPLETED
06/27/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. EVH PANELJAC SCDATE 062191 SCHPRD V
08/20/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PR PANEL SCDATE 082091 SCHPRD BA
09/24/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 092491 SCHPRD BE
09/24/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/23/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/23/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (PRINTED OP FILED 2/25/92)
01/23/1992SUBMITTED PANELFESTKG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -FE CITE (PRINTED OP FILED 2/25/92)
01/23/1992OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 0230 -A
01/23/1992AFFIRMED
02/13/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD