Case Information: 44835 | |||
Short Caption: | HEROLD (MARISSA) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR040570 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Becker for Justice Hardesty | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/09/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/09/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-04652 | |
03/23/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 05-05690 | |
03/30/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 05-06248 | |
03/30/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 05-06250 | |
04/13/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 05-07266 | |
05/31/2005 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Hardesty. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
07/05/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP05-NB/RR/MG | 05-13209 | |
08/02/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-13333 | |
08/02/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/12/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 3, 2005. | 05-13333 |