judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FLIPPO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MIKE PARKS DIVING CORPORATION

Case Information: 86-CV-0363
Short Caption:FLIPPO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MIKE PARKS DIVING CORPORATIONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4769-84Filed Date:02/25/1986

Opening Event Date:02/25/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/05/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/18/1986
Argued/Submitted:01/08/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Alan S. Anderson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Robert F. Leibner YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FLIPPO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MIKE PARKS DIVING CORPORATION ET AL
02/25/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/05/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/18/1986FiledBriefing Completed
01/08/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/17/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition