Case Information: 42884 | |||
Short Caption: | BENNICI VS. SUNRISE HOSPITAL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A401885 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/10/2004 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lynn R. Shoen, Chtd.--check no. 6677. | ||
03/03/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-04017 | |
03/10/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
04/12/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Dismissal of Appeal. | 04-06715 | |
05/04/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 04-08190 | |
05/18/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. On April 12, 2004, appellant filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. Appellant's notice is treated as a motion for voluntary dismissal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted and " . . . this appeal is dismissed." fn1[The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on March 31, 2004.] NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 04-09218 | |
05/18/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-06026 | |
05/18/2004 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |