Case Information: 42874 | |||
Short Caption: | WALKER (ANTHONY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44804 , 46335 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C195966 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Pretrial |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/02/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 04-03969 | |
03/25/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED without prejudice to appellant's right to appeal from any forthcoming final judgment of conviction in this matter." fn1[Although appellant filed this appeal in proper person, he is represented in the proceedings below by attorney Dean Y. Kajioka.] NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-05562 | |
04/20/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-06594 | |
04/20/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/30/2004 | Other | Returned Mail. Remittitur addressed to Anthony Walker returned. No forwarding address. | ||
05/13/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 22, 2004. | 04-06594 |