judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FORD, CAMILLE G. TURNER, MAURICE

Case Information: 86-CV-0356
Short Caption:FORD, CAMILLE G. TURNER, MAURICEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA17514-81Filed Date:02/21/1986

Opening Event Date:02/21/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/03/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/17/1986
Argued/Submitted:04/09/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard E. GardinerYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Victor E. LongYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FORD, CAMILLE G. TURNER, MAURICE ET AL
02/21/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/03/1986FiledRecord Completed
11/17/1986FiledBriefing Completed
04/09/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/05/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition