judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BURNS, LINDA HARVEY, CARDELIA

Case Information: 86-CV-0353
Short Caption:BURNS, LINDA HARVEY, CARDELIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT58780-85Filed Date:02/07/1986

Opening Event Date:02/07/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/18/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/14/1986
Argued/Submitted:02/24/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James A. DevitaYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BURNS, LINDA HARVEY, CARDELIA
02/07/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/18/1986FiledRecord Completed
10/14/1986FiledBriefing Completed
02/24/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/13/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition