judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRIAN A. MCEEWAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1472
Short Caption:BRIAN A. MCEEWAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14705-88Filed Date:12/18/1989

Opening Event Date:12/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/09/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/09/1991
Argued/Submitted:06/05/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/28/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBrian A. Mceewan N
Charles F. Stow YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Claudette V. Humphreys YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCEEWAN, BRIAN A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/1/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 BY 12/31/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 02 BY 2/4/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 02 2/25/91; SCHED CASE ON APRIL NOTE - 03 1991 CAL; NFX NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 02/07/91 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 04 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & BRF DUE NOTE - 05 TO BE FL 2/15/91; F/O BRF OF NOTE - 05 APLE DUE TO BE FILED 3/22/91; NOTE - 06 RBA OF APLT,IF ANY DUE 4/10/91 NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 3/25/91 ORD: 2/7/91 ORD IS NOTE - 07 VACATEDF; GRANT MO OF APLE TO NOTE - 08 EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/11/91 & NOTE - 08 REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE BY NOTE - 09 4/30/91; SCHED CASE ON MAY CAL NOTE - 09
12/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/23/1990RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1990ORDER APLT TO TENDER $50 FEE & FL THE DSA,DR, & SRT W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE MAY BE DISMD. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 052290 SCHPRD V
06/05/1990$50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1990ORDER APLT TO FL THE DSA, DR, & SRT W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE MAY BE DISMISSED. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD V
07/02/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PF PANEL SCDATE 070290 SCHPRD DSA
10/09/1990FiledRecord Completed
10/09/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(181 PGS/FARMER) AD PANEL SCDATE 102790 SCHPRD RT
11/01/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. FOR ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 101290 SCHPRD B
02/04/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-15-91 AD PANEL SCDATE 123190 SCHPRD BA
02/07/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 6 GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020491 SCHPRD BE
02/15/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 021591 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 11, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032291 SCHPRD BE
03/25/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-09. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 031891 SCHPRD TO
04/09/1991FiledBriefing Completed
04/09/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 041191 SCHPRD BE
06/05/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/05/1991SUBMITTED PANELSTSCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTIONS APPEALED FROM PANELSTSCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/28/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1991RECEIVED LTR FROM APLT REQUESTING COPY OF DECISION PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1991LETTER TO APLT TRANSMITTING COPY OF 6/7/91 DECISION PER APLT'S REQUEST. MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD