judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CURTIS A. SNOWDEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1475
Short Caption:CURTIS A. SNOWDEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1541-89Filed Date:12/06/1989

Opening Event Date:12/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/27/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/12/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCurtis A. Snowden N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Denise M. Abrahams YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SNOWDEN, CURTIS A. UNITED STATES
12/06/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
02/07/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD R
02/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (257-PGS/SALAZAR) AJ PANEL SCDATE 032390 SCHPRD RT
02/27/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/27/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FL LODGED DSA; F/O APLT'S BRF DUE 4/9. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD K
04/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD BA
04/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(55 PGS/MITCHELL) AD PANEL SCDATE 050290 SCHPRD SR
05/22/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 042390 SCHPRD U
06/29/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 070290 SCHPRD BA
07/16/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO AMEND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AD FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/12/1990SUBMITTED PANELTEFAWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF SUPERIOR COURT JUDGMENT PANELTEFAWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD