Case: 01-10-00220-CV
01-10-00220-CV
03/11/2010
Summary judgment
Henry Mamukuyomi
The Falls on Antoine and Guardian Transfer and Storage, Inc.
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/07/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | |
05/10/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/27/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||||
04/15/2011 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
03/31/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||
03/31/2011 | Judgment Issued | | |||||
03/30/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
02/07/2011 | Response due | | |||||
01/28/2011 | Order entered | Issue sua sponte order | | ||||
01/27/2011 | Fee requested | | |||||
09/23/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
09/02/2010 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
08/27/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/01/2010 | Response due | | |||||
06/11/2010 | Past due court fee notice | | |||||
06/09/2010 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
06/07/2010 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
06/07/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
06/07/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||
05/10/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
05/03/2010 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
04/26/2010 | Record due | | |||||
04/15/2010 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||||
04/08/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
04/08/2010 | Court fee due | | |||||
04/08/2010 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
04/06/2010 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
03/11/2010 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
03/11/2010 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
03/04/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
02/23/2010 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/27/2017 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mamukuyomi, Henry | Appellant | Gabriel Olu Giwa |
Guardian Transfer and Storage, Inc. | Appellee | Raymond H. Stauffacher Jr. |
The Falls on Antoine | Appellee | Raymond H. Stauffacher Jr. |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 2
Harris
Honorable Jacqueline Lucci Smith
939193