judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARCIA (FRANCISCO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34751
Short Caption:GARCIA (FRANCISCO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR2941Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/07/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-08163
09/01/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: August 27, 1999. 99-08268
09/20/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-08949
09/20/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. May 18 and 19, 1999 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Cecily Krawczyk. 99-08950
01/04/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: portion of trial transcript--5/18/98 and 5/19/98. Court Reporter: Cecily Krawczyk. 00-00136
03/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This is not a fast track appeal. Court reporter Krawczyk shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, comply fully with NRAP 9(b) and shall file with the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript of proceedings conducted in the action below on May 18, 1998, and May 19, 1998. 00-03353
03/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. Respondent shall, within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answering brief. Briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31 (a)(1). 00-03658
03/13/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Mary 18, 1998 and May 19, 1998. Court Reporter: Cecily Krawczyk. 00-03922
03/23/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 3/23/00. 00-04662
03/23/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-04663
04/19/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 4/18/00. 00-06217
04/19/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-06227
04/19/2000MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion for Modification of the Trial Transcript Record. 00-06235
05/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On April 19, 2000, respondent filed a "motion for modification of the trial transcript record." It is not entirely clear what type of relief respondent is seeking through this motion. We deny the motion. 00-08660
05/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. 00-09193
08/04/2000MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion for Supplemental Trial Court Record. 00-13562
09/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-15718
09/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The district court clerk shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, transmit the Supplemental Trial Court Record consisting of the Modification of the Trial Transcript which occurred on June 27, 2000 in the Fifth Judicial District Court. 00-16967
10/05/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Robert E. Glennen III, attorney of record for Francisco Garcia does hereby consent to the substitution of James Dean Leavitt. 00-17643
10/05/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Request for 60 days to file Supplemental Brief pursuant to NRAP 31(d) and for Oral Argument. 00-17645
10/10/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 06/27/00. Court Reporter: Stacy L. Briggs. 00-17897
11/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On October 5, 2000, attorney James Leavitt filed a "request for 60 days to file supplemental brief pursuant to NRAP 31(d) and for oral argument." No good cause appearing, we deny the motion. 00-19328
11/14/2000MotionFiled Motion. Request for Sixty (60) Days to File Supplemental Authorities pursuant to NRAP 31(d). 00-19889
11/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we remand this case and direct the district court to vacate appellant's conviction and sentence under count I for sexual assault, reinstate the conviction for statutory sexual seduction pursuant to the original jury verdict, and sentence appellant accordingly . . . appellant's conviction and sentence under count II, lewdness with a minor under the age of fourteen, is affirmed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20001
11/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On November 14, 2000, appellant filed a motion for a sixty-day extension of time to file supplemental authorities. fn1[We note that attorney James D. Leavitt entered an appearance on behalf of appellant on October 5, 2000, upon the filing of a substitution of attorneys.] On November 15, 2000, we entered an order of remand in this matter. We deny appellant's motion as moot. 00-20447
12/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20130
12/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2000. 00-20130