judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDWARD ALLEN HOLCOMB v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-288)
Case Number:06-288Case Docketed On:12/20/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:EDWARD ALLEN HOLCOMB v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:EDWARD ALLEN HOLCOMB, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEdward Allen HolcombNicholas H. Carter
Kurt A. Infanger
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 131
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/20/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/20/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/20/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/20/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/06/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/23/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
03/30/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, confidential file; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/16/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/20/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion sent to warden signed for 8/17/07 by Jessica Martinez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/04/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/06/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/5/07 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/06/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Mandate signed for 8/5/07 by D. Lopez for the WSP.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal