judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRENCE J. BARNETT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0851
Short Caption:TERRENCE J. BARNETT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-13727-09Filed Date:07/02/2010

Opening Event Date:07/02/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/30/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerrence J. Barnett YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
John L. HillYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Judith A. Lovelace, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Judith A. Lovelace, Esquire
08/04/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (13 pgs/Pirfo) 2/16/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (15 pgs/Pirfo) 2/19/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (146 pgs/Hawkins) 3/8/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (136 pgs/Maddox) 3/9/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (147-187 pgs/Hawkins) 3/9/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (188-386 pgs/Hawkins) 3/10/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (387-598 pgs/Hawkins) 3/11/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (599-802 pgs/Hawkins) 3/15/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (803-1041 pgs/Hawkins) 3/16/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (1042-1264 pgs/Hawkins) 3/17/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (116 pgs/Graybill) 3/18/10 proc. a.m.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (1265-1394 pgs/Hawkins) 3/18/10 proc. p.m.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (225 pgs/Pirfo) 3/22/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (226-372 pgs/Pirfo) 3/23/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (373-487 pgs/Pirfo) 3/24/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (488-505 pgs/Pirfo) 3/25/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (7 pgs/tape) 3/30/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (23 pgs/Kaczorowski) 6/18/10 proc.
09/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #19 (SEALED documents)
10/04/2010RECORD INDEX
10/04/2010RECORD COPIES
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/15/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/12/11. no oppo
11/19/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 12, 2011. (JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 7/15/11
04/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 15, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
07/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to August 1, 2011 (no oppo). (Appellant)
07/26/2011LodgedReceived letter regarding lack of communication and dissatisfaction with court-appointed counsel. (Appellant)
07/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
07/28/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellant's motion for extension of time within which to file the brief to 8/1/11.
07/28/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appellant referring appellant's letter received on July 26, 2011.
08/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (peremptory challenge form filed 3/10/10)
08/05/2011LodgedLetter From Appellant requesting that court-appointed counsel be relieved from duties due to lack of communication. (Appellant)
08/09/2011Filed***AMENDED ORDER*** Order Granting appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the brief and limited appendix to October 3. 2011.
08/15/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appellant referring the pro se letter received from appellant on July 25, 2011.
09/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #21 (97 pgs/Hawkins) 3/9/10 proc.
10/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #22 (28 pgs/Hawkins) 3/10/10 proc. w/cd
10/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 11/7/11.
11/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motions for extensions of time within which to file the lodged brief and limited appendix.
11/28/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/28/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 1/30/12.
01/30/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/30/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/09/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
05/16/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
05/16/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
05/29/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
05/31/2012FiledSubmitted to Glickman, Oberly, Pryor
06/06/2012FiledLetter To Judith Lovelace, Esq. re: Barnett's request for appointment of new counsel
06/19/2012FiledLetter To Judith Lovelace re: Terence Barnett's June 11, 2012 letter requesting new counsel
09/26/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
10/01/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
10/09/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
12/31/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing an banc.
01/08/2013FiledMandate
01/29/2013FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
02/27/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
11/14/2016FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
12/27/2016FiledTMC - Motion to Recall Mandate
02/10/2017FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion to recall the mandate.
04/27/2017FiledResponse To Order To Show Cause in filed in 17-CO-203 (construed as motion for reconsideration of denial of motion to recall mandate)(Appellant)Denied
04/28/2017FiledOrder Denying motion for reconsideration of denial of motion to recall mandate