Case: 13-07-00657-CV
13-07-00657-CV
10/18/2007
Miscellaneous civil
EARL ALFORD, JR. AND RITA ALFORD LEWIS, AS ADMINISTRATORS OF THE ESTATE OF EARL ALFORD
ALBERTO BELALCAZAR, M.D., PAUL FAREK, M.D., AND CHRISTUS SPOHN HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION D/B/A CHRISTUS SPOHN HOSPITAL CORPUS CHRISTI
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/28/2008 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
03/07/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
01/24/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/2009 | Case stored | | |||||
11/10/2008 | Record checked out | | |||||
11/04/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||||
08/21/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
05/29/2008 | Submitted | | |||||
05/08/2008 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
03/28/2008 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
03/19/2008 | Oral argument denied | | |||||
03/13/2008 | Record checked in | | |||||
03/12/2008 | Record checked out | | |||||
03/07/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
03/07/2008 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
02/27/2008 | Response filed | | |||||
02/27/2008 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/27/2008 | Motion filed | | |||||
02/25/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
02/21/2008 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/21/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
02/01/2008 | Record checked in | | |||||
01/30/2008 | Record checked out | | |||||
01/24/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
01/24/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
01/09/2008 | Record checked in | | |||||
01/03/2008 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
12/31/2007 | Letter filed | | |||||
12/28/2007 | Record checked out | | |||||
12/19/2007 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record | | |||||
12/19/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
12/18/2007 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
12/18/2007 | Record checked in | | |||||
12/18/2007 | Record checked out | | |||||
12/05/2007 | No reporters record filed in civil case | | |||||
11/19/2007 | Fee paid | | |||||
11/16/2007 | Mediation docketing statement returned | | |||||
11/16/2007 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
11/13/2007 | Fax received | | |||||
11/02/2007 | Mediation docketing statement returned | | |||||
11/02/2007 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
10/29/2007 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
10/25/2007 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
10/25/2007 | Clerks record received | | |||||
10/18/2007 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
08/31/2007 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/04/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Farek, M.D., Paul | Appellee | Hon. Richard C. Woolsey |
Belalcazar, M.D., Alberto | Appellee | Hon. Lisa A. Rocheleau |
Christus Spohn Health System Corporation d/b/a Christus Spohn Hospital | Appellee | Hon. Clay Coalson Hon. Robert J. Sigler |
Earl Alford, Jr. and Rita Alford Lewis | Appellant | Hon. Pamela D. Orsak Mari Gianukos |
Trial Court Information
347th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Nelva Gonzales Ramos
06-338-H