judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

QUINTIN G. BURBANK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1115
Short Caption:QUINTIN G. BURBANK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12289-87Filed Date:08/29/1988

Opening Event Date:08/29/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/14/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/18/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantQuintin G. Burbank N
Joseph R. Conte YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BURBANK, QUINTIN G. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEFENDANT NOTE - 01 TREAVOR L. BRADFORD
08/29/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH R. CONTE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD DSA
01/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD R
02/22/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-23-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD BA
03/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TRANSCRIPT IS COMPLETED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MOS FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD M
04/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(140 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 082989 SCHPRD RT
05/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD BA
07/03/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/14/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & BRFS OF APLT & APLE ARE FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD X
01/18/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/18/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD