judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE N. PEARSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1116
Short Caption:TYRONE N. PEARSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6983-87Filed Date:08/29/1988

Opening Event Date:08/29/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/07/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/03/1989
Argued/Submitted:04/03/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/30/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrone N. Pearson N
James W. KleinNY
Elizabeth G. Taylor YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William E. Lawler YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PEARSON, TYRONE N. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEFENDANTS: JAMES VENABLE, NOTE - 01 MICHAEL WATSON
08/29/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/14/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD DSA
09/26/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (114 PGS RT - FINNERIN) GT PANEL SCDATE 112788 SCHPRD RT
11/04/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF RT OF 6/20/88 PROCEEDING FROM CT RPTR FRANKLIN. EBP PANEL SCDATE 120388 SCHPRD RT
12/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (77 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD R
01/30/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(343 PGS/SIMMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 122089 SCHPRD RT
06/07/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/07/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (10 PGS/IRVING) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 16, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD BA
07/17/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/16/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 071289 SCHPRD M
08/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-30-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD BA
08/29/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/30/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD X
08/30/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD BA
09/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 3, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 100489 SCHPRD BE
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/03/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD M
11/03/1989FiledBriefing Completed
11/03/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110389 SCHPRD BE
04/03/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/03/1990SUBMITTED PANELTESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART MOJ RM CAUSE TO VACATE UUMV CONVICTION & SENTENCE...AF IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS PANELTESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/30/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD