judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRY A. PRINGLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0704
Short Caption:TERRY A. PRINGLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 87-CF-0700 Consolidated:87-CF-0704
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9203-86Filed Date:06/18/1987

Opening Event Date:06/18/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/18/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/31/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/05/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerry A. Pringle N
John A. Briley, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Craig S. Iscoe YN
John R. Fisher YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PRINGLE, TERRY A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: CLARENCE FORD & NOTE - 01 DEBORAH DUDD NOTE - 02 CON 87-700 NOTE - 02
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/12/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BRILEYJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ISCOEC FOR - APPELLEE
06/18/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN A. BRILEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD CHECK
08/05/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
08/20/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD R
09/18/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/18/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (476 PGS - SCHOCH) SEE 87-700 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 7, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 102887 SCHPRD BA
11/24/1987ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/7/87 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD CHECK
12/07/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/11/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/11/88; ANFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 120987 SCHPRD SL
02/10/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE APLT BR IN 10 DAYS OR VACATE APNTMT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD BA
02/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA
03/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 27TH MLH (PB) PANEL SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD BE
05/03/1988ORDER GRANT APLE REQ TO CONS 87-700 & 87-704; CONS BR OF APLE DUE 5/30/88. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 042788 SCHPRD BE
05/31/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/31/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 053088 SCHPRD BE
10/31/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988LETTER LTR GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 12/5/88 DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD OPE
12/05/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/05/1988ARGUED PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/30/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD