judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES W. PRINCE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0703
Short Caption:JAMES W. PRINCE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5601-85Filed Date:06/17/1987

Opening Event Date:06/17/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/12/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/24/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames W. Prince N
Thomas M. Slawson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Kelly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PRINCE, JAMES W. UNITED STATES
06/17/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS M. SLAWSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/12/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD R
08/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS JB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
08/17/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/14/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/14/1988ORDER GRANT MO TO FL DOCKETING STATEMENT & CLERK OF SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT RECORD FORTHWITH. PANELPY SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD OPE
03/31/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011588 SCHPRD R
04/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD BA
05/11/1988ORDER DENY APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR PENDING RT; FO: APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD M
05/20/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BA
06/24/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/24/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD BE
12/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/14/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER ON APPEAL PANELMKBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD