judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT L. BOLTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1135
Short Caption:ROBERT L. BOLTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11676-87Filed Date:08/29/1988

Opening Event Date:08/29/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/10/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/14/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/18/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert L. Bolton N
Gretchen FranklinYY
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOLTON, ROBERT L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/13/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 GRETCHEN FRANKLIN TO APPEAR NOTE - 02 PRO HAC VICE FOR APLT; CLK OF NOTE - 02 SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT GOV'T NOTE - 03 EXHIBIT 1-C TO THIS CRT AS A NOTE - 03 SUPP REC FORTHWITH. NOTE - 04 8/14/89 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO TO NOTE - 04 FILE BRF AND THE LODGED BRF OF NOTE - 05 APLE IS HEREBY FILED. FO THAT NOTE - 05 THIS APPEAL SHALL BE SCHD FOR NOTE - 06 CONSIDERATION AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 06 CALENDAR PERMITS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/01/18 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - FRANKLING FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MCLARENM FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 FRANKLING MOTION: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
08/29/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/19/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD DSA
11/04/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING THE TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING TRANS- CRIPT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RT(364 PGS /RUST) AND (6 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD R
12/27/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 6/8/88 RT FROM CT RPTR JACKSON. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(15 PGS/ALLISON) AD PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1989MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON APPEAL WITH EXHIBITS (STIPULATED BY BOTH PARTIES) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR GRETCHEN FRANKLIN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD Q
04/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(GOVERMENT'S EXHIBITS 1-C) AD PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD SR
05/11/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-8-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 051189 SCHPRD BE
06/08/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/8/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-8-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD BE
07/07/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/8/89. ACG PANELRBH SCDATE 060689 SCHPRD K
08/08/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/14/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 6 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD N
12/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/02/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD VS
01/11/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE REPLY BRF AND CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED REPLY BRF SL PANELNWFETE SCDATE 122989 SCHPRD VS
01/11/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/18/1990ARGUED PANELNWFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD