judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILBERT BROOKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0804
Short Caption:WILBERT BROOKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead:87-CF-0804Consolidated: 87-CF-0821
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F063-86Filed Date:07/13/1987

Opening Event Date:07/13/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/03/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/21/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilbert Brookins N
Peter N. MannYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
W. Mark Nebeker YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROOKINS, WILBERT AKA WILBUR BROOKS UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: LEROY E. JAMES, JR. NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 051188 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 02 FOR EXT TO FILE BRIEF ONLY TO NOTE - 03 THE EXTENT THAT COUNSEL W/IN NOTE - 03 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NOTE - 04 STATUS OF MO FOR PRODUCTION OF NOTE - 04 RT. NOTE - 05 CON 87-821 NOTE - 05
07/13/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER N. MANN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/25/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082587 SCHPRD DSA
09/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD R
10/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (30 PGS - HAWKINS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (453 PGS TR - RAMOS) GT PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD RT
02/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
02/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/01/1988ORDER COUNSEL FO APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. PB PANELPY SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD BA
04/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS TO MAY 23RD JB PANEL SCDATE 041188 SCHPRD BA
04/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 20 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD OPE
05/11/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 042888 SCHPRD M
05/17/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD STATE
06/21/1988ORDER SS, CONS 87-804 & 87-821; APLT BR IN 87-821 DUE IN 40 DAYS & CON APLE BR DUE 30 AFT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD BE
06/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-821 JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD BA
07/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/1/88 GT (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 080288 SCHPRD BE
09/01/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 29TH JB PB PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD BE
09/29/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1988FiledBriefing Completed
10/03/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/21/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/23/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD