judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WESLEY E. MARTIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0779
Short Caption:WESLEY E. MARTIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9223-86Filed Date:06/29/1987

Opening Event Date:06/29/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/29/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWesley E. Martin N
Mindy A. DanielsNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MARTIN, WESLEY E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ROBERT RAY, GREGORY NOTE - 01 HINKLE,
06/29/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD CHECK
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 082887 SCHPRD R
08/24/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
03/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (780 PGS - WATKINS) GT PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
04/18/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
05/31/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/27/88 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 053088 SCHPRD BA
06/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1988RECEIVED SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (27 PGS - RHOADES) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/08/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO W/D APPEAL & CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 060288 SCHPRD V
07/08/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
07/29/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD