judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM H. MC FADDEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0778
Short Caption:WILLIAM H. MC FADDEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead:87-CF-0778Consolidated: 88-CF-0440
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12713-86Filed Date:07/10/1987

Opening Event Date:07/10/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/06/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/10/1991
Argued/Submitted:03/18/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam H. Mcfadden N
Gary T. BrownYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Julie G. Weidenbruch YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCFADDEN, WILLIAM H. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 BRIEF IN 87-778 MLH NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 7/7/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 02 FOR LV TO FL OPPO TO MO FOR NOTE - 03 SUMM REV & CLK TO FL OPPO;DENY NOTE - 03 MO OF APLT FOR SUMM REV;GRANT NOTE - 04 MO OF APLE TO CONS 87-778 & NOTE - 04 87-916; BRF OF APLT IN 87-778 NOTE - 05 DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 CON 88-440 NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 7/28/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 07 TO CONS 88-440 W/87-778 & 87- NOTE - 08 916; BA IN 88-440 DUE BY 8/8; NOTE - 08 BA IN 87-778 DUE BY 8/17/88; NOTE - 09 CNSOLIDATED BR DUE 30 DAYS NOTE - 09 THEREAFTER. NOTE - 10 092088 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO TO NOTE - 10 STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS IN NOTE - 11 THESE APPEALS PENDING DISPOSI- NOTE - 11 TION OR APLT'S MO FILED IN THE NOTE - 12 TRIAL CRT PER D.C. CODE 23-110 NOTE - 12 FO; COUNSEL FOR APLT MCFADDEN NOTE - 13 W/IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NOTE - 13 STATUS OF 23-110 MO, W/A COPY NOTE - 14 OF THE MOTION ATTACHED. NOTE - 14 NOTE - 15 10/23/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 15 IN 87-916 FOR RECONSID TO NOTE - 16 EXTENT THAT 87-916 SEVERED NOTE - 16 FROM 87-778 & 88-440; BRF OF NOTE - 17 APLE IN 87-916 DUE IN 30. NOTE - 17 NOTE - 18 7/10/91 ORD: APLE MO X TM FL NOTE - 18 LODGED BRF GRNTD. F/O CLERK NOTE - 19 TO FILE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT NOTE - 19 FROM PROCEEDINGS OF NOTE - 20 JUNE 18, 19, & 22, 1987, IN NOTE - 20 APPEAL NO. 87-916 AS SUP. REC. NOTE - 21 F/O CASE SCHEDULED READY FOR NOTE - 21 CONSIDERATION BY MERITS DIV. NOTE - 22 AS SOON AS CALENDAR PERMITS. NOTE - 22
07/10/1987NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GARY T. BROWN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD CHECK
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 090887 SCHPRD R
08/31/1987RECEIVED APLT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
10/27/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1987ORDER CLK TO FILE LDGD DSA; COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STAT OF MO IN TR CT. PANELPY SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD CHECK
11/12/1987STATEMENT OF APLT IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S 10/27/87 ORDER PB PANEL SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD STATE
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (220 PGS - RUST) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1988ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT EBP PANELPY SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD CHECK
03/22/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO COMPLY WITH 2/18/88 ORD OR VACATE APPNTMNT EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030988 SCHPRD STATE
04/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MARCH 22ND COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 040188 SCHPRD STATE
04/07/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO MARCH 22ND COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 87-916 & TO FILE APPEL- LEE'S BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER FILING OF APPELLANT'S(NOTE 1) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL WITH APPEAL # 88-440 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051188 SCHPRD OPA
07/07/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-09. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RESOLUTION OF PROCEEDINGS BELOW RJG PANEL SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD BA
09/20/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10 - 14. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
09/30/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 20TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD STATE
10/03/1988MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPELLANT IN 87-916 OF OR- DER 9/20/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 6/22-6/23/87 RT FROM CT RPTR GLEASON - COMP & FILED IN 87-916. EBP PANEL SCDATE 080588 SCHPRD RT
12/14/1988ORDER APLT IN 87-778 TO FILE COPY OF SUP MO W/IN 5 DAYS; DENY MO FOR RECONSIDERATION. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD CHECK
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY TO ORDER 12-14-88 IN 87-778 AD PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD ANS
03/23/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT MCFADDEN IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STAT OF 23-110 MO IN TR CT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD CHECK
03/31/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT PURSUANT TO ORDER 3/23/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD STATE
07/07/1989ORDER APLT TO ADVISE CRT IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF 23-110 MO PENDG IN TRL CRT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD CHECK
09/05/1989MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IN 87-916 OF ORDER GRANTING STAY OF APPEAL OR TO SEVER APPEALS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 15-17. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD OP
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (ORDER 11/4/88, 12/8/88, 4/5/89, 12/8/89, 3/29/90, 3/29/90 JUDGE KING) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990RECORD COMPLETED
06/29/1990STATEMENT TO 23-110 MO IN TRIAL COURT AD PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD CHECK
07/10/1990ORDER DIRG APLT'S BRIEF BE FILED W/ IN 40 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (?) AD PANEL SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD BA
09/18/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF W/I 30 DAYS OF ORDER. NFX. JJ PANELFF SCDATE 091090 SCHPRD B
10/05/1990MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPELLANT OF THE COURT'S 9/18/90 ORDER EXTENDING THE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 101890 SCHPRD BA
01/25/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (84 PGS. -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031491 SCHPRD RT
02/25/1991ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR RECONSIDERA- TION TO EXTENT THAT BRIEF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS FROM ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 101290 SCHPRD U
03/27/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 26, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032791 SCHPRD BA
04/10/1991ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & BRF OF APLT DUE TO BE FILED ON 4/15/91; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 032991 SCHPRD V
04/22/1991ORDER DIR. APLT COUNSEL TO FL BRF W/IN 5 DAYS OR VACATE APPT. & REFER TO BAR. AD PANELRO SCDATE 041891 SCHPRD K
04/23/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1991MOTION(S) FEE PAID RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1991ORDER GR APLT MO FOR LV TO FL BRF; BA FILED; BE DUE 30 DAYS. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 050791 SCHPRD K
06/10/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3 DAYS PMB PANEL SCDATE 061091 SCHPRD BE
06/14/1991MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT JOINT STIPULATION OF PARTIES TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1991RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 18 - 22 GR PANELJWR SCDATE 062191 SCHPRD GR
07/10/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/18/1992ARGUED before JJ RG FE WG Argument by Gary T. Brown, Esq., counsel for appellant; and by Julie G. Weidenbruch, Esq., counsel for appellee.
08/14/1992MANDATE ISSUED
08/14/1992MANDATE ISSUED
09/02/1992ORD GRT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB on or before September 11, 1992. (RO)