judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEFFREY W. SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0791
Short Caption:JEFFREY W. SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-0791Consolidated: 87-CF-1112
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F408-87Filed Date:07/02/1987

Opening Event Date:07/02/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/02/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/02/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/29/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJeffrey W. Smith N
Judith L. Gorfkle YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sharon M. Collins YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, JEFFREY W. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: RONALD MINOR NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 12/28/87 ORD: GRANTG MO OF NOTE - 02 APLT FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE NOTE - 03 APLT'S BRF TO EXTEND BRIEF IS NOTE - 03 DUE IN 30 DAYS; REFERRING MO NOTE - 04 FOR RELEASE OF ITEM OF NOTE - 04 EVIDENCE TO THE TRIAL CT FOR NOTE - 05 ITS CONSIDERATION IN THE FIRST NOTE - 05 INSTANCE. NOTE - 06 022488 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 06 TO CONS 87-791 & 87-112; FO: NOTE - 07 GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE NOTE - 07 BR IN 87-791, CLK TO FILE LDGD NOTE - 08 BR; FO: CONS BR OF APLE DUE IN NOTE - 08 30 DAYS. NOTE - 09 CON 87-1112 NOTE - 09
07/02/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JUDITH L. GORFKLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/19/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD R
10/26/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (653 PGS - RHOADES) JB PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD RT
10/27/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/24/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO RELEASE ITEM OF EVIDENCE & TO EXTEND TO FILE BRIEF TO FEB 3RD JB PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
12/28/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 120887 SCHPRD DDW
01/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD BA
01/28/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 - 08. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 020988 SCHPRD OPE
02/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/5/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 032588 SCHPRD BE
04/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/5/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD BE
04/29/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRF TO 5/5/88 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD N
05/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 19TH JB PB PANEL SCDATE 050588 SCHPRD BE
05/19/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/02/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 060188 SCHPRD V
07/07/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT IN #87-1112 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF IN #87-1112 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 87-1112 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/02/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988SUBMITTED PANELRGNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/29/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD