judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REBECCA HATTON and ASA HATTON v. ENERGY ELECTRIC CO., a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (06-32)
Case Number:06-32Case Docketed On:02/17/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:REBECCA HATTON and ASA HATTON v. ENERGY ELECTRIC CO., a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:REBECCA HATTON and ASA HATTON, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. ENERGY ELECTRIC CO., a Wyoming corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRebecca HattonWilliam R. Fix
Jenna V. Mandraccia
AppellantAsa HattonWilliam R. Fix
Jenna V. Mandraccia
AppelleeEnergy Electric Co.John Robert Goodell

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2006 WY 151
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/17/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/17/2006Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel for appellee Energy Electric Co. indicating that they should be the only appellee. Upon review of the order appealed from, the caption was changed accordingly. Sent notice to counsel this date.EventPhone CallFinal
02/27/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter (Amended)Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/06/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/22/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/09/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/12/2006Notice-Incoming - No designation of record. Received letter from district court clerk indicating that she did not have a designation from counsel for appellee.Notice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
06/13/2006Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
06/21/2006Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
06/22/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/15/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/03/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/03/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/09/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal