judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RORY C. WILSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0887
Short Caption:RORY C. WILSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD2748-10Filed Date:07/12/2010

Opening Event Date:07/12/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/12/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRory C. Wilson Y
George E. RickmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kristina L. AmentNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that George Rickman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) George Rickman, Esquire
09/15/2010MOT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE STMT RE TRANSCRIPT (unopposed)
09/15/2010RECEIVED - Statement Regarding Transcript
10/04/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
10/04/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
10/12/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (59pgs/Geddes) 5/26/10 proc. Part I
10/12/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (21pgs/Geddes) 5/26/10 proc. Part II
10/12/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (6pgs/Tape) 5/27/10 proc. w/CD
10/12/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/13/2010RECORD INDEX
10/13/2010RECORD COPIES
10/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (Pretrial Services report filed 2/13/10)
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/06/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief (sent back, motion required)
12/06/2010RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (sent back, motion required)
12/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (unopposed)
12/08/2010RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Appendix
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
12/15/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/15/2010APPENDIX
01/13/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/14/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion for summary reversal - appellant's brief
02/23/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to Motion for Summary Affirmance until March 11, 2011 (unopposed) (Titled as: Motion to Enlarge Time in which to File . . . Reply Brief)
03/01/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and appellant's response, if any, to appellee's motion for summary affirmance shall be filed NO LATER THAN MARCH 11, 2011 and no further requests for extensions of time will be granted. (BY: CASTILLO) LW
03/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL (Cross-motion).
05/12/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED. It is ****MORE*****
05/12/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ***MORE****
05/12/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (BROBST*) *JST would deny the motion for summary affirmance...SEE HARDCOPY
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC
06/10/2011ORDER that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response to pet for reh en banc (10 copies). (WH)
06/20/2011APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEno oppo for 30 days
06/21/2011ORD GRT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to pet for reh en banc on or before July 25, 2011. (WH)
07/20/2011FiledOpposition - to aplt's petition for rehearing/or rehearing en banc (Appellee)
09/21/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc
10/07/2011FiledMandate