judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALONZO DOBSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0787
Short Caption:ALONZO DOBSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F85946-76Filed Date:07/02/1987

Opening Event Date:07/02/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/25/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/18/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/15/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/09/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlonzo Dobson N
Greta C. Van Susteren YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DOBSON, ALONZO UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE: 13214 JMT REMANDED FOR NOTE - 01 FURTHER PROCEEDINGS NOTE - 02 3/18/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 02 TO STRIKE APPENDIX OF APLT'S NOTE - 03 BRF;GRANT MO OF APLE TO SUPP & NOTE - 03 CLK OF SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 04 RT LISTED IN APLE'S MO AS SUPP NOTE - 04 REC FORTHWITH;GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 05 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO NOTE - 05 FL BRF OF APLE; CLK TO SCHED NOTE - 06 CASE FOR CONS AS SOON AS BIZ NOTE - 06 OF CRT PERMITS.
07/02/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GRETA C. VAN SUSTEREN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 080787 SCHPRD CHECK
08/25/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/25/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD R
08/26/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
08/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS MLH PANEL SCDATE 082887 SCHPRD CHECK
09/25/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE DSA; CLK TO FILE LDGD DSA; FO: APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090887 SCHPRD OPE
11/04/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 110487 SCHPRD BA
12/04/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 7, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120987 SCHPRD BE
01/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 010788 SCHPRD BE
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (17 PGS. -- SANBORN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1988APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE NON-RECORD MATERIAL FROM APLTS APPENDIX PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1988RECEIVED BRIEF OF APPELLEE. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/18/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-06. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD Q
03/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE APPELLATE RECORD) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/15/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELPYNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD