judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN GREEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0798
Short Caption:JOHN GREEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7768-85Filed Date:06/30/1987

Opening Event Date:06/30/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/12/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/10/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/27/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Green N
Charles F. Stow NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
B. Milile Archibald YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
William J. Hochul YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREEN, JOHN aka EARL McCORMACK/EROL PRYCE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 JOHN GREEN, AKA EARL MCCORMACK NOTE - 01 AKA EROL PRYCE, AKA JAMES NOTE - 02 THOMAS NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 TO 7/12/88 MLH NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 8/8/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 04 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 05 OF CHARLES F. STOW III & APPT NOTE - 05 MILELE B. ARCHIBALD FOR APLT; NOTE - 06 BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 4/10/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 07 TO EXT TM & CLK TO FL BRF OF NOTE - 08 APLE; GRANT MO OF APLE TO SUPP NOTE - 08 REC & CLK TO FL RT OF THE PRE- NOTE - 09 TRIAL PROCEEDINGS AS SUPP REC; NOTE - 09 CLK TO SCHED CASE AS SOON AS NOTE - 10 CAL PERMITS. NOTE - 10
01/01/1906 STOWC VACATED 8/8/88.
06/30/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CHARLES F. STOW, III, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD R
08/28/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
10/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS MLH PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD CHECK
11/18/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 111087 SCHPRD OPE
11/18/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE DSA, APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD RT
02/12/1988FiledRecord Completed
02/12/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (379 PGS TR - RAMOS) GT PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD RT
02/16/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 21, 1988 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD BA
04/25/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 4/20/88, FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT-AP- POINTED COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/06/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT IN RESPONSE TO APLT'S LTR SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL TO EX- TEND TIME TO ASCERTAIN APPEL- LANT'S ATTORNEY STATUS (NOTE 3 PANEL SCDATE 052188 SCHPRD BA
07/13/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF CHARLES F. STOW AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) B. MILELE ARCHIBALD, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-06. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 080488 SCHPRD GG
09/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/21/88 (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD BA
10/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 28, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 102188 SCHPRD BA
10/31/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 5TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL BRF, APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRO SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD V
01/05/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-7-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 010589 SCHPRD BE
02/06/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/7/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-14-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENT TO RE- CORD (2 TRANSCRIPTS, 10/14/86 & 12/15/86, F7768-85) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(9 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-10. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 022089 SCHPRD OPA
04/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD RT OF PRE-TRIAL PROCEEDINGS. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/27/1989SUBMITTED PANELBESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELBESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RY CITE
10/11/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RY PAGE # - 3182
11/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD