judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRISTOPHER BOURN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0723
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER BOURN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10005-85Filed Date:06/11/1987

Opening Event Date:06/11/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/28/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/17/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/17/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChristopher Bourn N
William G. DansieYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Per A. Ramfjord YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOURN, CHRISTOPHER UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/10/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DANSIEW FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - RAMFJORDP FOR - APPELLEE
06/11/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM G. DANSIE, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD R
09/04/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
09/24/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA OR VACATE APPNTMNT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD DSA
10/19/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD DSA
11/23/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(238 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD RT
11/28/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 8TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD BA
01/17/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/8/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 010689 SCHPRD V
02/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 18TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 020889 SCHPRD BA
02/14/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/18/89. ANY FUR REQ WILL BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 020889 SCHPRD V
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 021889 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-20-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD BE
03/17/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 032489 SCHPRD CHECK
04/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/17/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD BE
05/05/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/17/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 042689 SCHPRD OPA
05/17/1989FiledBriefing Completed
05/17/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 051789 SCHPRD BE
10/17/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/17/1989ARGUED PANELRGTEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1989AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART JUDGMENT AF IN PART JUDGMENT ON APPEAL/CAUSE RM TO VACATE MARIJUANA POSSESSION CONVICTN PANELRGTEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 567 A.2d 1312
12/28/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 3211
01/08/1990LETTER FROM USAO RE: ERROR IN PUB. OPINION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 1/8/90 LTR OF APLE TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD