judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICKY BRANDON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0720
Short Caption:RICKY BRANDON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8708-86Filed Date:06/17/1987

Opening Event Date:06/17/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/11/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/02/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/05/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/17/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRicky Brandon N
James W. KleinNY
Deborah A. Trevino YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Roberto Iraola YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BRANDON, RICKY UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/12/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - TREVINOD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - IRAOLAR FOR - APPELLEE
06/17/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD R
12/11/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (208 PGS - TOOBY) JB PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
12/14/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 22, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD BA
02/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 23, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA
03/07/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF ON OR BEF 3/23/88 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD N
03/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 22ND (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD BA
03/28/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/22/88- ANFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD V
04/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD BA
05/26/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE TO FILE BRIEF UNDER SEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/02/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF **UNDER SEAL** DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO FL BRF UNDER SEAL & CLK TO FL. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 052788 SCHPRD Q
06/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (ONE SEALED ENVELOPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988LETTER LTR GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM VAL OF 12/5/88 DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/05/1988ARGUED PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989REMANDED ORDER RM CASE FOR PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT w/OPINION FILED PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 553 A.2d 640
01/27/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0117
02/17/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD