judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VERA E. HARDIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0796
Short Caption:VERA E. HARDIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 87-CF-0555 Consolidated:87-CF-0796
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6771-86Filed Date:07/07/1987

Opening Event Date:07/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/28/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/06/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVera E. Hardin N
James W. Robertson NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Edith S. Marshall YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARDIN, VERA E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JOHN HARPER NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 3/14/88 ORD: GRANT MO TO REIN- NOTE - 02 STATE 87-796; SS, CONS 87-796 NOTE - 03 & 87-555 & CLK TO FL BRF OF NOTE - 03 APLT IN 87-796;CONS BRF OF NOTE - 04 APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 87-555 NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 4/19/88 ORD: GRT MO OF APLT NOTE - 06 FOR LV TO FILE SUPPL BRF AND NOTE - 07 MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FILE NOTE - 07 BRF. CLK DIRTD TO FILE LODGED NOTE - 08 SUPPL BRF OF APLT IN NO. NOTE - 08 87-555. APLE'S BRF SHALL BE NOTE - 09 FILED ON OR BEF 4/28/88. NOTE - 09
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/12/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DANIELSM FOR - APLT HARPER ATTY 2 - ROBERTSONJ FOR - APLT HARDIN ATTY 3 - MARSHALLE FOR - APPELLEE
07/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 090787 SCHPRD R
08/25/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (486 PGS RT-SCHOCH) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/02/1987ORDER APLT TO FILE DSA IN 10 DAYS OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071787 SCHPRD DSA
09/14/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD DSA
09/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(33 PGS. -- MAJORS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (7 PGS - RONAN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/09/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED (RE ATTY NO ADDITIONAL RT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD BA
02/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/12/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD BA
02/18/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR NOT COMPLYING WITH 1/27 ORDER OR BY LODGING BRIEF. CWC PANELPY SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD OPE
02/26/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO REINSTATE APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 030888 SCHPRD X
03/24/1988RECEIVED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF APPEL- LANT IN 87-555 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1988APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO IN 87-555 MLH PANEL SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD CHECK
04/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/28/88 (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD BE
04/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 9 SL PANELPY SCDATE 041388 SCHPRD Q
04/19/1988APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM IN NO. 87-555 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/28/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 042888 SCHPRD BE
12/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT OF APPELLANT FOR TWO WEEK PERIOD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1988ORDER DENIED APLT'S MO TO POSTPONE ORAL ARG. PB PANELFETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1988ARGUED PANELFETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENTS OF CONVICTION PANELFETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD