judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT L. BASSIL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0795
Short Caption:ROBERT L. BASSIL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:87-CF-0795Consolidated: 88-CF-0688
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F753-87Filed Date:07/02/1987

Opening Event Date:07/02/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/25/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/07/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert L. Bassil N
Terrence M. O'Connor YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Su Zann Lamb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BASSIL, ROBERT L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ROBERT HEBRON NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 8/11/87 ORD: DISMISSING 87-865 NOTE - 02 AS A DUPLICTE OF THIS CASE; NOTE - 03 GRANTG APLT'S MO FOR APPT OF NOTE - 03 COUNSEL; APPOINTING TERRENCE NOTE - 04 O'CONNOR, ESQ., TO REPRESENT NOTE - 04 APLT HEREIN; NEW COUNSEL TO NOTE - 05 FILE AMENDED DOCKETING STMT NOTE - 05 W/IN 10 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORD. NOTE - 06 11/25/87 ORD: GRANT MO FO APLT NOTE - 06 FOR STAY PENDG TRL MO; APLT TO NOTE - 07 INFORM THIS CRT IN 30 DAYS AS NOTE - 07 OF STATUS OF TRIAL MO. NOTE - 08 070788 ORDER: SS, CONS 87-795 NOTE - 08 & 88-688, CLK OF SUP CT TO NOTE - 09 PREPARE & TRANSMIT RECORD IN NOTE - 09 88-688 FORTHWITH; FO: CONS BR NOTE - 10 OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFT REC & NOTE - 10 RT ARE FILED W/THIS CT. NOTE - 11 CON 88-688 NOTE - 11
07/02/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) TERRENCE M. O'CONNOR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD RBH
08/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082187 SCHPRD DSA
08/25/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/25/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 AND 07. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD CHECK
12/30/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 11/25/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD CHECK
02/01/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT TO ORDER 11/25/87 GREG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR REVIEW OF TRIAL COURT'S DENIAL OF BOND PENDING APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR BOND MLH PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD OPE
03/30/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (427 PGS - SWARINGER) JB PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD RT
04/11/1988ORDER DENY MO FOR BOND; PARTIES TO ADVISE CRT IN 20 DAYS RE DISP OF PROCEEDINGS IN SUPER CRT.AG PANELNWRO SCDATE 030188 SCHPRD CHECK
05/02/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO APRIL 11TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 050288 SCHPRD ANSA
05/09/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO INFORM CRT OF DISP OF PENDG MO IN TRL CRT DAS PANELPY SCDATE 050288 SCHPRD ANSE
05/09/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING MOTION TO STAY FILED IN LOWER COURT GT PANEL SCDATE 052788 SCHPRD ANSA
07/07/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08 - 10. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD M
07/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (80 PGS RT - RONAN) GT PANEL SCDATE 080288 SCHPRD RT
07/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
09/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD V
10/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 1, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG DAS PANEL SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD BE
11/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/29/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 120188 SCHPRD BE
12/20/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BE; CLK TO SCHED CASE ASAP. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD OPA
01/03/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/07/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING THE JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM SL PANELMKNWGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989SUBMITTED SL PANELMKNWGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD