judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CEDRIC M. STOKES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0734
Short Caption:CEDRIC M. STOKES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1437-86Filed Date:05/21/1987

Opening Event Date:05/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/13/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/29/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/09/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/16/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCedric M. Stokes N
Bruce M. Clarke YN
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Matthew C. LeeferNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Roy W. McLeese, IIIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STOKES, CEDRIC M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/13/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 01 RECALL MANDATE AND THE CLK OF NOTE - 02 SUP. CT. SHALL RETURN THE NOTE - 02 MANDATE ISSUED 12/9/88 NOTE - 03 FORTHWITH. FO THAT MATTHEW C. NOTE - 03 LEEFER, ESQ., IS HEREBY APPTD NOTE - 04 FOR THE PURPOSE OF FILING A NOTE - 04 PET FOR REHEARING W/I 20 DAYS NOTE - 05 FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. NOTE - 05
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - CLARKEB FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MCLEESER FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 LEEFERM TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING
05/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/16/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/18/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
01/13/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/13/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (295 PGS - DAVIS) PB PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD RT
02/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/23/88 (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA
03/23/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD BA
04/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/11/88 (NO OPA) MLH (PB) PANEL SCDATE 042788 SCHPRD BE
04/29/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/29/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 051188 SCHPRD BE
09/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG SUM CAL OF 11/9/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD OPE
11/08/1988LETTER OF APPELLANT REGARDING SUPPLE- MENTAL AUTHORITIES PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 11/8/88 LTR OF COUNSEL FOR APLT TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/09/1988ARGUED PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED (RECALLED 1/13/89) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO RECALL THE MANDATE & EXT. TIME TO FILE PET. FOR REHEARING, ETC. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989MANDATE RECALLED SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MATTHEW C. LEEFER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 5 SL PANELFESTGA SCDATE 122088 SCHPRD VS
02/02/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IF MRHA IS GRANTED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1989APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING TO 2/17/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REHRG ON OR BEFORE 2/17/89 (NFX) SL PANELRO SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD CHECK
02/17/1989PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC (APPELLANT) JB PANEL SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD MRHA
03/16/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD