Case: 01-04-01321-CV
01-04-01321-CV
12/29/2004
Miscellaneous/other civil
Courtney Rutherford
The Traces Loft Village Management, inc., and Ultimate Landscape and Irrigation
No
11th Court of Appeals
02/08/2005
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/02/2005 | Court Reporter's Notice to Court Regarding Status of Record | | |
02/08/2005 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
02/07/2005 | Clerk's record received (transcript) | | |
02/03/2005 | Record due | | |
01/29/2005 | Filing fee due per our notice/order. | | |
01/24/2005 | No Court Reporter Record to be filed in this case. | | |
01/24/2005 | Docketing statement filed | | |
01/24/2005 | Docket Statement Due per our Docketing Order | | |
01/20/2005 | Appellate filing fee paid. | | |
12/29/2004 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |
10/25/2004 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |
10/06/2004 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/08/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The Traces Loft Village Management, inc., and Ultimate Landscape and Irrigation | Appellee | Kristopher M. Stockberger |
Rutherford, Courtney | Appellant | Harold B. Jarnigan |
Trial Court Information
11th District Court
Harris
Honorable Mark Davidson
0369928