judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AMADOR (LUIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 40959
Short Caption:AMADOR (LUIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR022499Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/19/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-02790
03/11/2003Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 03-04078
04/02/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 7, 2003. 03-05494
04/04/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-05686
04/04/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-05687
04/09/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-05966
06/12/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-09823
07/08/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-10018
07/08/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/31/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 9, 2003. 03-10018