judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ABDUL LATIF V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1088
Short Caption:ABDUL LATIF V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F20618-77Filed Date:08/19/1988

Opening Event Date:08/19/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/08/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/09/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/18/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Neil H. Jaffee YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
David M. Zlotnick YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LATIF, ABDUL AKA CARL E. ROPER UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/12/89 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO SUPP REC W/PIT PREJ TO ITS NOTE - 02 RENEWAL PROVIDED THE NEW MO NOTE - 02 FILED IS SPECIFIC OF THE NOTE - 03 DESIGNATION OF THE SUPP REC NOTE - 03 TO BE FL; BRF OF APLT DUE IN NOTE - 04 IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 6/27/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 05 TO SUPP REC & CLK OF SUPER CRT NOTE - 06 TO TRANSMIT DOCUMENTS LISTED NOTE - 06 IN APLT'S MO TO SUPP REC TO NOTE - 07 THIS CRT FORTHWITH; COUNSEL NOTE - 07 FOR APLT TO MAKE ARRANGEMENTS NOTE - 08 TO HAVE RT OF APLT'S SENTENCNG NOTE - 08 PROCEEDINGS HELD ON 12/6/77 NOTE - 09 ORDERED, PREPARED & TRANSMITTD NOTE - 09 TO THIS CRT.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/05/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - JAFFEEN FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ZLOTNICKD FOR - APPELLEE
08/19/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/01/1988DESIGNATION OF RECORD SRT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1988$50.00 DOCKETING FEE MLR PANEL SCDATE 100688 SCHPRD CHECK
10/07/1988$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/29/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 101888 SCHPRD R
11/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(108 PGS/TOOBY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(334 PGS/PAVLISH)(13 PGS/ GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1988APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD & FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE OPENING BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD BA
01/09/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO SUP REC & FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD M
03/15/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(159 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 021589 SCHPRD RT
04/11/1989APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AND TO STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD BA
06/12/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD Q
06/16/1989APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-09. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 062089 SCHPRD Q
08/04/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(ORDER JUDGE ROGERS DATED 6/28/89 AND EXHIBITS AD PANEL SCDATE 072789 SCHPRD SR
08/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(10 PGS/TOOBY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7(STIP TO SUPP RECORD ON APPEAL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 27, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 102589 SCHPRD BE
10/30/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/27/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 102689 SCHPRD V
11/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-27-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 12/27/89; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 121489 SCHPRD V
12/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-28-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 122789 SCHPRD BE
12/28/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD V
04/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 ( ORDS/J. NUNZIO/3/23/90) JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION APLE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT MO TO RESCHEDULE ORAL ARGEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD OPE
04/26/1990RECEIVED LETTER FRON NEIL JAFFEE RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1990MEMORANDUM APLT'S REPLY BRIEF TRANSMITTED TO DIVISION. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1990ORDER APLT'S MO TO RESCHEDULE ORAL ARGUMENT IS DENIED. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 042090 SCHPRD VS
05/09/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/09/1990ARGUED PANELNWFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/25/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/25/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/18/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD