judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID C. SCUTCHINGS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1067
Short Caption:DAVID C. SCUTCHINGS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11524-87Filed Date:08/15/1988

Opening Event Date:08/15/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/30/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/17/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/03/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/17/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid C. Scutchings N
James W. KleinNY
John M. Mott YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SCUTCHINGS, DAVID C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/01/03 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MOTTJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - VELTROPV FOR - APPELLEE
08/15/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/29/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD DSA
09/06/1988STATEMENT OF APLT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) 12 PGS. -- JANIFER RJG PANEL SCDATE 101488 SCHPRD R
01/30/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/30/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(6 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 122388 SCHPRD RT
03/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 12TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD BA
04/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 13, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989ORDER GRT BRIEF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 10 DAYS FROM THE OF THIS ORD. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD V
04/28/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/13/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD BA
05/15/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 051389 SCHPRD BA
06/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-19-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD BE
06/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/19/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD CHECK
07/12/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 17TH JB PANEL SCDATE 071989 SCHPRD BE
07/28/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 8/17/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 072689 SCHPRD V
08/17/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/17/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 081789 SCHPRD BE
10/12/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (6 PGS/SWAGERTY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/03/1990ARGUED PANELFEBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 570 A.2d 1197
03/08/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 0625
03/22/1990PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990ORDER THAT APLE W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH EB (10 COPIES) SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 050290 SCHPRD ANSE
07/17/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD