judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUDOLPH A. FRENCH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0799
Short Caption:RUDOLPH A. FRENCH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9072-86Filed Date:06/25/1987

Opening Event Date:06/25/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/08/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRudolph A. French N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FRENCH, RUDOLPH A. UNITED STATES
06/25/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/01/1987STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. PANELPY SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/07/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD R
08/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/24/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER RECEIPT OF REMAINING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
11/02/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100687 SCHPRD OPE
02/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (274 PGS - SHELTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 021588 SCHPRD RT
04/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 5TH (NO OPPO) JB (PB) PANEL SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD BA
05/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 050588 SCHPRD BA
05/17/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/17/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELPY SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD V
05/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
06/08/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD