judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES B. CRAWFORD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0797
Short Caption:JAMES B. CRAWFORD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4295-85Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:09/06/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/27/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames B. Crawford N
John A. Briley, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Norman C. Bay YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CRAWFORD, JAMES B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/2/89 ORD: APLT TO SHOW CAUSE NOTE - 01 IN 10 DAYS WHY MO TO ENLARGE NOTE - 02 ISSUES ON APPEAL SHLD NOT BE NOTE - 02 DENIED FOR FAILURE TO FL A NOTE - 03 SEPARATE NOA FROM THE TRL CRTS NOTE - 03 DENIAL OF APLTS' MO FOR NEW NOTE - 04 TRL; DECISION OF APLTS MO TO NOTE - 04 VACATE STAY HELD IN ABEY PENDG NOTE - 05 COMPLIANCE OF THIS ORDER. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 010890 ORD: THIS COURT'S MAY NOTE - 06 2, 1989 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS NOTE - 07 VACATED CAUSE HAVING BEEN NOTE - 07 SHOWN; F/O MOTION TO VACATE NOTE - 08 STAY IS GRANTED; F/O MOTION NOTE - 08 TO ENLARGE ISSUES ON APPEAL IS NOTE - 09 DENIED; F/O APLE'S BRF DUE IN NOTE - 09 30 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/09/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BRILEYJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BAYN FOR - APPELLEE
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN A. BRILEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/25/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
08/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS JB PANEL SCDATE 090287 SCHPRD CHECK
08/31/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 090787 SCHPRD R
09/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (PRO SE) LETTER REQUESTING INFORMATION JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1987LETTER LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT REFERRING APLT'S 11/17/87 LTR DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (299 PGS - RAMOS) JB PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
12/14/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 7, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD BA
02/02/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012988 SCHPRD X
03/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 03/15/88 NO OPE GT PANEL SCDATE 030288 SCHPRD BA
03/15/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE BRF; CLK TO FILE BRF; APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 030488 SCHPRD N
04/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 16TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD BE
05/13/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR STAY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 16TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD BE
05/23/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO STAY CASE PENDG APLT'S NEW TRL MO;STAYED PENDG F/O OR THIS CRT. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD Q
07/26/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (17 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(292 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
11/08/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 11/4/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1988ORDER CNSL FOR APLT W/I 30 DAYS TO ADVISE THIS CT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MO PDG IN TRIAL CT. SL PANELRO SCDATE 062388 SCHPRD CHECK
01/13/1989APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO VACATE STAY & TO ORDER APPELLEE'S TO FILE BRF IN 40 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD ANS
05/02/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSETO OTSC UNTIL MAY 19, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD ANSA
05/19/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MEMO IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 5/5/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, REGARDING STATUS OF CASE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR RECEIVED 7/10/89 SL PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR OF 8/15/89 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-09. MEH PANELNWBETE SCDATE 122889 SCHPRD VS
02/06/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 7, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 020890 SCHPRD BE
02/20/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/7/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020890 SCHPRD V
03/07/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 9, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 030790 SCHPRD BE
03/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990RECEIVED OF APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD V
09/06/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/06/1990ARGUED PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JMT ON APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 090690 SCHPRD RDEC
02/06/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/27/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1992LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR RECVD 2/13/92 SL PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1992LETTER to appellant in response to his letter received July 8, 1992, regarding transcripts of oral argument. (JAC)
01/12/2001LETTER to appellant returning his motion to reinstate appeal. (JAC)