judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARVEY D. BLOCKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0699
Short Caption:HARVEY D. BLOCKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6874-86Filed Date:06/18/1987

Opening Event Date:06/18/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/27/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/09/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/05/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarvey D. Blocker N
John C. Floyd, IIIYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas C. Black YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BLOCKER, HARVEY D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 120387 ORDER: APLT TO TAKE NEC NOTE - 01 STEPS TO CAUSE RT TO BE TRANS- NOTE - 02 MITTED TO THIS COURT OR THIS NOTE - 02 CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. NOTE - 03 011388 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 03 ONLY TO EXTENT THAT APLT BR IS NOTE - 04 DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED; NOTE - 04 FO: COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DYS NOTE - 05 TO FILE STATE RE: WHAT PORTION NOTE - 05 OF RT ORDERED WILL BE TRANSMTD NOTE - 06 TO THIS COURT. NOTE - 06
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/12/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - FLOYDJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BLACKTH FOR - APPELLEE
06/18/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S -- FILED BY PDS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1987APPEARANCE OF JOHN FLOYD FOR HARVEY BLOCKER RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT OF APPELLANT FILED BY NEWLY RETAINED COUNSEL J. FLOYD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD R
08/27/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (RTC) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/03/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 02. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091887 SCHPRD RT
12/11/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO CONTINUE APPEAL & STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT PREPARATION PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 06. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD RT
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (118 PGS. -- SWARINGER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8 PGS - SWARINGER) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (8 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO COMPLY WITH THIS CTS 1/13/88 ORDER OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 020388 SCHPRD STATE
04/22/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR FAILURE OF APLT TO COMPLY W/1-13 & 3/30/88 ORDERS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD RT
04/25/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO REINSTATE APPEAL & STATEMENT OF TRANSCRIPTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO REINSTATE; BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE REC IS FL. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051288 SCHPRD Q
08/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (192 PGS - TREMEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
12/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 80 DAY EXT. & NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT ONLY TO EXTENT BR DUE IN 30 DAYS - NFX EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD M
03/06/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD BA
04/13/1989ORDER DIRG APLE, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE CAL ON R & BA ALONE. FH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 9TH JB PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD BE
04/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-9-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-8-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/09/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD OPA
06/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(109 PGS/FINNERIN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989LETTER GRTG REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 102689 SCHPRD N
12/05/1989ARGUED PANELTESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD