judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EARL R. CEPHUS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0689
Short Caption:EARL R. CEPHUS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8446-85Filed Date:06/10/1987

Opening Event Date:06/10/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/07/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/16/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEarl R. Cephus N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CEPHUS, EARL R. UNITED STATES
06/10/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/01/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS PANELPY SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD CHECK
07/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD DSA
08/07/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/07/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/07/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD R
08/10/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (20 PGS. - LEWIS) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 091687 SCHPRD BA
11/13/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (76 PGS - IRVING) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL REGARD- ING TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (26 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 040188 SCHPRD RT
06/14/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 5/4/87 RT FROM CT RPTR HAWKINS (CASE NOT ON CALENDAR) EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989ORDER CLK OF SUP CT TO TRANSMIT 9/19/86 RT TO THIS CT AS SUP REC W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
03/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(104 PGS/WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 033189 SCHPRD RT
04/18/1990STATEMENT APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (7-PGS/ARTIS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(8 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 080490 SCHPRD RT
12/04/1990ORDER APLT BRF SHALL BE FILD W/IN 40 DAYS FRM THE DATE OF THIS ORD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 110790 SCHPRD GR
12/14/1990STATEMENT OF APLT OF COUNSEL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1991ORDER SUA SPONTE, THAT THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED JB PANELSTWAKN SCDATE 042391 SCHPRD VS
05/21/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: LOCATION OF APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION APLT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1991ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO REINSTATE; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELSTWGKN SCDATE 081391 SCHPRD VS
10/15/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE UNTIL MDSA IS FILED PMB PANEL SCDATE 101591 SCHPRD BA
11/04/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/25/1991ORDER APLT MO TO DIS IS GR. APLT MO TO STAY IS DEN AS MOOT. CASE IS DISMISSED. AC PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/16/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD