judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MELVIN KENNEDY, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0761
Short Caption:MELVIN KENNEDY, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6194-80Filed Date:06/22/1987

Opening Event Date:06/22/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMelvin Kennedy, Jr.N
David Carey WollYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KENNEDY JR., MELVIN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 MOTION IN TRIAL COURT MLH NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 11/16/87 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO. NOTE - 02 TO HOLD APPEAL IN ABEYANCE AND NOTE - 03 APLT IN 30 DAYS TO ADVISE THIS NOTE - 03 COURT OF STATUS OF THE SEC. NOTE - 04 23-110 MOTION FILED IN THE NOTE - 04 TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 05 1/29/88 ORD: CNSL FOR APLT ON NOTE - 05 OR BEF 3/4/88 SHALL ADVISE NOTE - 06 THIS COURT AS TO WHETHER HE NOTE - 06 INTENDS TO FILE A MOTION IN NOTE - 07 THE SUP.CT. PURSUANT TO NOTE - 07 D.C. CODE SEC. 23-110. NOTE - 08 3/14/88 ORD: APLT SHALL FILE NOTE - 08 THE 23-110 MO IN THE TRIAL CT. NOTE - 09 W/I 20 DAYS FM DATE OF THIS NOTE - 09 ORDER AND ABSOLUTELY NFX. FO NOTE - 10 THAT APLT SHALL SERVE A COPY NOTE - 10 OF SAID MO. TO THE CLK OF THIS NOTE - 11 COURT AND ADVISE THIS CT. NOTE - 11 IMMED. UPON DISP. OF MOTION. NOTE - 12 5/24/88 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 12 FOR RECONSID W/OUT PREJ TO NOTE - 13 RENEWAL IN EVENT TRL CRT NOTE - 13 INDICATES WILLINGNESS TO GRNT NOTE - 14 RELIEF REQ IN 23-110 MO; BRF NOTE - 14 OF APLT DUE IN 20 DAYS. NOTE - 15 013189 ORD: GRANT MO FOR LV TO NOTE - 15 FL OPPO TO MO TO DISMISS & NOTE - 16 CLERK TO FL LODGED OPPO; NOTE - 16 GRANT MO TO DISMISS W/O NOTE - 17 PREJUDICE TO APLT FILING A NOTE - 17 PTN FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS OR NOTE - 18 NOTING AN APPEAL AT THE TIME NOTE - 18 THE 23-110 MO HAS BEEN ACTED NOTE - 19 UPON BY THE TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 19
06/22/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID CAREY WOLL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
08/21/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 082187 SCHPRD R
08/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/05/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO HOLD APPEAL IN ABEYANCE PENDING FILING & DE- CISION OF A 23-110 (NOTE 1) PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
11/16/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 4 SL PANELPY SCDATE 102787 SCHPRD CHECK
12/17/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 11/16/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 121687 SCHPRD STATE
01/20/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING 23-110 MOTION FILED IN TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 7 SL PANELPY SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD CHECK
03/04/1988STATEMENT OF APLT'S COUNSEL RE: 1/29/88 ORDER RJG PANEL SCDATE 030488 SCHPRD STATE
03/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 THRU 11 SL PANELPY SCDATE 031088 SCHPRD Q
04/04/1988STATEMENT OF APLT RE: 23-110 MOTION IN SUPERIOR COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD CHECK
04/06/1988ORDER VACATING 11/16/87 ORDER; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS-ANFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD CHECK
04/18/1988MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPELLANT OF COURT'S ORD DATED 4/6/88 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 12-14. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 050588 SCHPRD Q
06/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 29TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 061488 SCHPRD BA
06/23/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 6/29/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 061688 SCHPRD V
06/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 062988 SCHPRD BA
07/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/29/88 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD BE
08/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITIONTO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL LATE GT PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD CHECK
01/31/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/31/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 15-19 ACG PANELMKBE SCDATE 011389 SCHPRD VS
01/31/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
02/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD