judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES J. FRYE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0757
Short Caption:JAMES J. FRYE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2798-86Filed Date:06/26/1987

Opening Event Date:06/26/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/12/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/02/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames J. Frye N
Nancy R. Beiter NN
AppellantJames J. Frye N
Sidney R. BixlerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FRYE, JAMES J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/22/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 02 VACATE APPMT OF NANCY R. NOTE - 02 BEITER & APPT SIDNEY R. BIXLER NOTE - 03 FOR APLT. NOTE - 03
01/01/1906 BEITERN VACATED 11/22/88.
06/26/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) NANCY R. BEITER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/14/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
08/21/1987RECEIVED RECORD PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (90 PGS - HUNT) GG PANEL SCDATE 103087 SCHPRD RT
10/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/14/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD BA
12/08/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD EBP
03/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (258 PGS - HUNT) PB PANEL SCDATE 010188 SCHPRD RT
03/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 042088 SCHPRD BA
05/13/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 20, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 052088 SCHPRD BE
06/20/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT GT PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BE
06/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (26 PGS - SHELTON) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (41 PGS - JACKSON) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1988RECEIVED CERT OF 8/27/86 RT-KACZOROWSKI & OF 7/16/86 RT BY MOLLICHELLI EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (4 PGS RT - MOLLICHELLI) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 30 DAYS AFT RT HAS BEEN FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070788 SCHPRD M
09/12/1988FiledBriefing Completed
09/12/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (3 PGS RT - SWARINGER) GT PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
11/04/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF NANCY R. BEITER AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SIDNEY R. BIXLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD CHECK
03/02/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/02/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTION ON APPEAL PANELMKBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD