judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANGUSH L. BOSTIC V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0759
Short Caption:ANGUSH L. BOSTIC V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7741-86Filed Date:06/25/1987

Opening Event Date:06/25/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/08/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/21/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAngush L. Bostic N
Thomas Reed Kennedy YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Kelly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOSTIC, ANGUSH L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: LAWRENCE BROWN NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 101487 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 02 IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE INDI- NOTE - 03 CATING THE DATE RT WAS ORDERED NOTE - 03 THE NAME OF THE CT RPTR PRE- NOTE - 04 PARING THE RT, ESTIMATED # OF NOTE - 04 PAGES TO BE FILED & EST COMP NOTE - 05 DATE OF THE RT. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 3/14/88 ORD: VACATE THIS CT'S NOTE - 06 3/7/88 ORDER AND CLK IS DIRTD NOTE - 07 TO FILE THE LODGED APLT'S NOTE - 07 BRIEF. FO THAT APLE'S BRIEF NOTE - 08 SHALL BE FILED W/I 30 DAYS FM NOTE - 08 THE DATE OF THIS ORDER.
06/25/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS REED KENNEDY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD R
08/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/24/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
10/14/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD CHECK
10/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (219 PGS - KACZOROWSKI) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER DATED 10/14/87 RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD STATE
11/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (9 PGS - JOYNER) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110587 SCHPRD CHECK
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (6 PGS. -- SCHOCH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 16TH (NO OPPO) JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
02/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEB. 16TH (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD BA
03/07/1988ORDER APLT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/I 10 DAYS FM DATE OF THIS ORDER AND ABSOLUTELY NFX SL PANELPY SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD N
03/10/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S 3/7/88 ORDER SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 8 SL PANELPY SCDATE 031788 SCHPRD BA
04/08/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/08/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 041388 SCHPRD BE
10/21/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/21/1988SUBMITTED PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/14/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD