judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES D. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0701
Short Caption:JAMES D. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10426-86Filed Date:06/19/1987

Opening Event Date:06/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/20/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/27/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/08/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/06/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames D. Williams N
Allan P. Mackinnon YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Kelly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, JAMES D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/15/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO FILE BRIEF AND CLK NOTE - 02 IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED APLT'S NOTE - 02 BRIEF. FO THAT APLE'S BRIEF NOTE - 03 SHALL BE FILED W/I 30 DAYS NOTE - 03 FM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER.
06/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALLAN P. MacKINNON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT PB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
08/14/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 082187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/20/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/20/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 081887 SCHPRD R
09/03/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD 234 PGS. -- FRNAKLIN RJG PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
12/18/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 20, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD BA
01/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 9TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 012088 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/9/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD N
02/10/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 020988 SCHPRD BA
02/10/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELPY SCDATE 022588 SCHPRD N
04/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 30TH JB PANEL SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD BE
05/02/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 051188 SCHPRD OPA
05/24/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/30/88. PB PANELPY SCDATE 051788 SCHPRD V
05/27/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/27/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 053088 SCHPRD BE
06/09/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/08/1988SUBMITTED PANELBETERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTION ON APPEAL PANELBETERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/06/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD